Global patent index - EP 0910259 B1

EP 0910259 B1 2000-04-19 - DENTAL HYGIENE DEVICE WITH REPLACEABLE CLEANING PART

Title (en)

DENTAL HYGIENE DEVICE WITH REPLACEABLE CLEANING PART

Title (de)

ZAHNPFLEGEGERÄT MIT AUSWECHSELBAREM PFLEGETEIL

Title (fr)

APPAREIL D'HYGIENE BUCCO-DENTAIRE A PIECE DE NETTOYAGE REMPLA ABLE

Publication

EP 0910259 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97930373 A

Priority

  • DE 19624962 A
  • EP 9703208 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19624962A1] The invention relates to a dental hygiene device, for example a toothbrush, with a handle, a head and a cleaning part which can be inserted to lock in a hollow thereof, said cleaning part being ejectable by a resilient pressure member arranged on the back of the head and acting on the rear side of the cleaning part by pressurisation. To achieve a tight seal on said rear and to manipulate in a simple manner, the invention provides for the head to have a rear opening which is closed by the pressure member and into which the cleaning part engages, and the pressure member to be in the form of a flexible, plastic disc and the peripheral edge thereof to be fixed to the wall of the opening to form a seal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46B 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 7/04 (2006.01); A46B 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 7/042 (2013.01); A46B 7/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19624962 A1 19980102; AR 007434 A1 19991027; AR 007435 A1 19991027; AT 191832 T 20000515; AU 3261697 A 19980114; AU 3435197 A 19980114; AU 717524 B2 20000330; AU 717623 B2 20000330; BR 9709935 A 19990810; BR 9709936 A 19990810; CA 2258096 A1 19971231; CN 1105529 C 20030416; CN 1109522 C 20030528; CN 1222836 A 19990714; CN 1222837 A 19990714; CZ 289271 B6 20011212; CZ 289680 B6 20020313; CZ 9804215 A3 19990414; CZ 9804216 A3 19990414; EP 0910259 A1 19990428; EP 0910259 B1 20000419; EP 0942668 A1 19990922; EP 0942668 B1 20001102; ES 2145612 T3 20000701; ES 2152101 T3 20010116; HU 220332 B 20011228; HU 222070 B1 20030428; HU 9902958 A2 19991228; HU 9902958 A3 20000728; HU 9903352 A2 20000228; HU 9903352 A3 20000628; ID 17155 A 19971204; ID 19309 A 19980702; IN 191386 B 20031129; IN 192227 B 20040320; JP 2000512522 A 20000926; JP 2000513957 A 20001024; JP 3821853 B2 20060913; KR 20000016738 A 20000325; KR 20000022069 A 20000425; NO 985853 A 19981214; NO 985853 D0 19981214; PL 183466 B1 20020628; PL 186489 B1 20040130; PL 330526 A1 19990524; PL 330722 A1 19990524; RO 115775 B 20000630; RU 2171084 C2 20010727; RU 2171085 C2 20010727; SK 175598 A3 19990712; SK 281757 B6 20010710; TR 9802645 T2 19990322; TW 392456 U 20000601; TW 392457 U 20000601; US 6138316 A 20001031; US 6145153 A 20001114; WO 9749314 A1 19971231; WO 9749315 A1 19971231; ZA 9705497 B 19980130; ZA 9705498 B 19980130

INPADOC legal status

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-04-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59701476

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120103

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100620

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100619

2011-07-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20110715

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100619

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100619

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100716

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090626

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090514

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090629

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090629

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: CORONET-WERKE G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2000-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-07-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-07-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-07-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: RACHELI & C. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2145612

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-06-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000619

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000522

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701476

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-25

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 191832

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000204

1999-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981210

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT NL PT SE