Global Patent Index - EP 0910470 A4

EP 0910470 A4 2000-08-09 - HIGH ACTIVITY CATALYSTS FOR THE PREPARATION OF POLYETHYLENE WITH AN INTERMEDIATE MOLECULAR WEIGHT DISTRIBUTION

Title (en)

HIGH ACTIVITY CATALYSTS FOR THE PREPARATION OF POLYETHYLENE WITH AN INTERMEDIATE MOLECULAR WEIGHT DISTRIBUTION

Title (de)

KATALYSATOREN MIT HOHER AKTIVITÄT ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYETHYLEN MIT MITTLERER MOLEKULARGEWICHTSVERTEILUNG

Title (fr)

CATALYSEURS A FORTE ACTIVITE POUR LA PREPARATION DE POLYETHYLENE AVEC UNE REPARTITION INTERMEDIAIRE DES POIDS MOLECULAIRES

Publication

EP 0910470 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97932291 A

Priority

  • US 9711078 W
  • US 67716396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9802245A1] A supported alpha-olefin polymerization catalyst composition of this invention of improved activity as measured by productivity is prepared in a multi-step process. An ethylene homopolymerization or ethylene copolymerization catalyst is formed by: (i) providing a slurry of a solid porous inorganic support having reactive hydroxyl (-OH) groups and a non-polar solvent; (ii) impregnating said support having -OH groups, with RMgR' compound, to form an intermediate, which intermediate has an -OH group:Mg ratio of less than 1, wherein each of said R and R' is alkyl of 1 to 12 carbon atoms and is the same or different; (iii) treating the intermediate with TiC14 to form a titanium containing intermediate which has an -OH group:Ti ratio of less than 1; (iv) reacting the titanium containing intermediate with an amount of oxygen containing electron donor containing 1 to 15 carbon atoms, combining the electron donor treated titanium containing intermediate with triethylaluminum to form the catalyst. The catalyst also produces polymers having relatively intermediate molecular weight distribution.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01J 31/26; B01J 31/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 31/12 (2006.01); B01J 31/14 (2006.01); B01J 31/26 (2006.01); B01J 31/32 (2006.01); B01J 31/38 (2006.01); C08F 4/60 (2006.01); C08F 4/654 (2006.01); C08F 4/658 (2006.01); C08F 10/00 (2006.01); C08F 10/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08F 10/00 (2013.01); B01J 31/122 (2013.01); B01J 31/143 (2013.01); B01J 31/38 (2013.01); Y02P 20/52 (2015.11)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08F 10/00 + C08F 4/651
  2. C08F 10/00 + C08F 4/6546

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9802245 A1 19980122; AU 3578797 A 19980209; AU 715831 B2 20000210; CA 2260026 A1 19980122; EP 0910470 A1 19990428; EP 0910470 A4 20000809; JP 2000514492 A 20001031; KR 20000023620 A 20000425; TW 494111 B 20020711

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040113

2002-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021004

2001-10-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION

2000-08-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 01J 31/26 A, 7B 01J 31/32 B, 7C 08F 10/00 B

2000-08-09 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990204

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL