Global Patent Index - EP 0910511 B1

EP 0910511 B1 2001-12-19 - LETTER OPENER

Title (en)

LETTER OPENER

Title (de)

BRIEFÖFFNER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR OUVRIR DES LETTRES

Publication

EP 0910511 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98902923 A

Priority

  • CH 9800072 W
  • CH 56897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9840227A1] The invention relates to a letter opener, especially a manually operated letter opener, which is able to open a standard letter without producing waste. To this end the letter opener comprises a circular knife (3) mounted between two rails (4, 40) and pretensed by spring (7). The diameter of said knife is slightly smaller than double the smallest possible distance between the knife axis and the surface (1) supporting the letter.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B43M 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B43M 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B43M 7/00 (2013.01); Y10S 83/912 (2013.01); Y10T 83/7763 (2015.04); Y10T 83/8776 (2015.04); Y10T 83/8822 (2015.04)

Citation (examination)

EP 0703097 A1 19960327 - HADEWE BV [NL]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9840227 A1 19980917; CA 2254849 A1 19980917; CA 2254849 C 20061017; DE 59802514 D1 20020131; EP 0910511 A1 19990428; EP 0910511 B1 20011219; US 6125732 A 20001003

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140224

2014-12-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802514

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141031

2014-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140224

2014-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802514

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130430

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130522

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130201

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: WERNER FENNER PATENTANWALT;HOFACHER 1;5425 SCHNEISINGEN (CH)

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020402

2002-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WERNER FENNER PATENTANWALT

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802514 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2000-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000607

1999-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981106

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI