Global Patent Index - EP 0910542 B1

EP 0910542 B1 2000-04-26 - PACKAGING A STRIP OF MATERIAL

Title (en)

PACKAGING A STRIP OF MATERIAL

Title (de)

VERPACKEN EINER MATERIALBAHN

Title (fr)

EMBALLAGE D' UNE BANDE DE MATERIAU

Publication

EP 0910542 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98929172 A

Priority

  • CA 9800592 W
  • US 87882697 A
  • US 88973797 A
  • US 93944497 A
  • US 94825697 A
  • US 94825897 A
  • US 97503797 A
  • US 2489098 A
  • US 6474498 A
  • US 8182698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9858864A1] A package (10) of a continuous strip (11) of material comprises a plurality of parallel side by side stacks (20, 21, 22, 23) each containing a length of the strip (11) which is folded back and forth such that each folded portion of the stack (20, 21, 22, 23) is folded relative to the next portion about a line transverse to the stip (11) and such that the side edges of the strip portions are aligned. The strip (11) is continuous through each stack (20, 21, 22, 23) and is connected by a splice (46) from the end of one stack to beginning of the next stack. The package (10) is compressed to reduce the height of the stacks (20, 21, 22, 23) and maintained in the compressed condition by an evacuated sealed bag (40). The preferred package arrangement uses the package (10) for pay off of the strip (11) in the orientation in which it is formed with the bottom of the stacks (20, 21, 22, 23) resting on a support and the package (10) tilted to one side so that the stacks (20, 21, 22, 23) lean against a support surface (81) for stability. The spliced connecting portions (44, 45) extend along one end of the package (10) and are folded to take up the difference in height between the compressed condition and the released condition for unfolding. A spacer plate (58) prevents the connecting portion from being wrinkled against the end of the package (10) under the compression from the bag.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 45/101; B65H 21/00; B65D 83/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/08 (2006.01); B65D 85/07 (2017.01); B65D 85/08 (2006.01); B65D 85/67 (2006.01); B65H 21/00 (2006.01); B65H 45/101 (2006.01); B65H 75/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/1015 (2013.01); B65D 85/67 (2013.01); B65H 21/00 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42162 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4622 (2013.01); B65H 2701/11231 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1824 (2013.01); B65H 2701/18242 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9858864 A1 19981230; AT 192117 T 20000515; AU 734791 B2 20010621; AU 7902898 A 19990104; BR 9810162 A 20000808; CA 2274272 C 20000418; CN 1201989 C 20050518; CN 1260760 A 20000719; CZ 9904590 A3 20010815; DE 19881126 T1 19990923; DE 69800128 D1 20000531; DE 69800128 T2 20001214; DK 0910542 T3 20000925; EA 001473 B1 20010423; EA 200000034 A1 20000828; EP 0910542 A1 19990428; EP 0910542 B1 20000426; ES 2148007 T3 20001001; GR 3034008 T3 20001130; HK 1020185 A1 20001208; HU 0004788 A2 20010528; HU 0004788 A3 20020628; IL 133569 A 20030624; IL 133569 D0 20010430; JP 2002507174 A 20020305; JP 2003312758 A 20031106; JP 2004238207 A 20040826; KR 100399777 B1 20030929; KR 20010013989 A 20010226; NZ 500798 A 20000428; OA 11263 A 20030730; PL 187211 B1 20040630; PL 337160 A1 20000731; PT 910542 E 20001031; SK 181599 A3 20010312; SK 283739 B6 20031202; TR 199903129 T2 20000821

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150618

2016-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-07-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160727

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150617

2016-04-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-03-02 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150701

2016-02-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150618

2016-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150617

2016-02-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150617

2016-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150617

2016-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-01-25 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69800128

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140609

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140610

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-09-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20140610

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140513

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140612

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140611

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140611

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20140610

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140611

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-03-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 192117 T

- Effective date: 20110617

2012-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110617

2012-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111219

2011-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *STAC PAC TECHNOLOGIES INC.

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-12-26 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20111219

2010-10-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100630

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100507

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-07-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20100510

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-08 [REG GB S28] RESTORATION OF CEASED PATENTS (SECT. 28/PAT. ACT 1977)

- Effective date: 20080915

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070617

2008-05-21 [REG GB S28] RESTORATION OF CEASED PATENTS (SECT. 28/PAT. ACT 1977)

2008-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070617

2006-03-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-01-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2005-06-17 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050617

2005-04-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: BKI HOLDING CORPORATION

2004-07-28 [REG GB 728Y] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION ALLOWED (SECT. 28/1977)

2004-06-25 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20040625

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-11 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20040611

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-02-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-12-17 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-03-12 [REG GB 728V] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION FILED (SECT. 28/1977)

2003-02-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020617

2002-04-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: CONCERT GMBH

2002-04-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

2002-04-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KARL MENZEL MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH & CO./ AA TECH SY

2002-01-23 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: CONCERT GMBH * 20010125 THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPA

- Effective date: 20010122

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: BKI HOLDING CORPORATION

2001-05-30 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BKI HOLDING CORPORATION

2001-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: CONCERT GMBH

2001-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

2001-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KARL MENZEL MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH & CO./ AA TECH SY

2001-03-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CONCERT GMBH

- Effective date: 20010122

2001-03-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20010125

2001-03-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KARL MENZEL MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH & CO./ AA TECH SY

- Effective date: 20010126

2001-03-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CONCERT GMBH

- Effective date: 20010122

2001-01-31 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2000-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000724

2000-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148007 T3

2000-09-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KATZAROV S.A.

2000-09-29 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: STAC PAC TECHNOLOGIES INC. TRANSFER- BKI HOLDING C

2000-09-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: RACHELI & C. S.R.L.

2000-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-06-17 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000617

2000-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800128 20000531

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19990128;LT PAYMENT 19990128;LV PAYMENT 19990128;MK PAYMENT 19990128;RO PAYMENT 19990128;SI PAYMENT 19990128

2000-04-26 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

2000-04-26 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192117 T 20000515

1999-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990812

1999-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990216

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19990128;LT PAYMENT 19990128;LV PAYMENT 19990128;MK PAYMENT 19990128;RO PAYMENT 19990128;SI PAYMENT 19990128