Global Patent Index - EP 0910699 B1

EP 0910699 B1 2002-11-06 - PROCESS FOR IMPROVING PRINTING PAPER

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR IMPROVING PRINTING PAPER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG VON DRUCKPAPIEREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'AMELIORATION DE PAPIER D'IMPRESSION

Publication

EP 0910699 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97932781 A

Priority

  • DE 19627669 A
  • EP 9703597 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19627669A1] The invention relates to a process for improving the capacity of gravure printing and offset printing for printing paper. To increase the filler proportion in the paper web before or during formation, the outer layers of the material suspension forming the web are provided with an additional retention agent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 21/10; D21H 23/76

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21H 21/10 (2006.01); D21H 23/76 (2006.01); D21H 17/29 (2006.01); D21H 17/32 (2006.01); D21H 17/37 (2006.01); D21H 17/55 (2006.01); D21H 17/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 21/10 (2013.01); D21H 23/76 (2013.01); D21H 17/29 (2013.01); D21H 17/32 (2013.01); D21H 17/37 (2013.01); D21H 17/55 (2013.01); D21H 17/56 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19627669 A1 19980115; DE 19627669 C2 20010301; AT 227375 T 20021115; DK 0910699 T3 20021125; EP 0910699 A1 19990428; EP 0910699 B1 20021106; ES 2182105 T3 20030301; NO 324374 B1 20071001; NO 990046 A 19990106; NO 990046 D0 19990106; US 6251223 B1 20010626; WO 9801622 A1 19980115

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080709

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080709

2009-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080709

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080708

2009-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080708

2009-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-05-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080708

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090201

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080708

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090201

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080708

2009-03-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-03-02 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2009-02-27 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: STORA ENSO PUBLICATION PAPER AG

- Free text: STORA ENSO PUBLICATION PAPER AG#FELDMUEHLEPLATZ 1#40545 DUESSELDORF (DE) -TRANSFER TO- STORA ENSO PUBLICATION PAPER AG#FELDMUEHLEPLATZ 1#40545 DUESSELDORF (DE)

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070710

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071008

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070728

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070703

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070704

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070704

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070711

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-24 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20070712

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-08-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070824

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-07-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-07-18 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070718

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-06-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070627

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-06-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182105 T3

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708673 20021212

2002-11-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227375 T 20021115

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: STORA ENSO PUBLICATION PAPER AG

2002-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020516

1999-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990126

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE