Global Patent Index - EP 0910728 B1

EP 0910728 B1 2000-07-19 - HYDRAULIC PLAY COMPENSATING ELEMENT

Title (en)

HYDRAULIC PLAY COMPENSATING ELEMENT

Title (de)

HYDRAULISCHES SPIELAUSGLEICHSELEMENT

Title (fr)

ELEMENT HYDRAULIQUE DE COMPENSATION DE JEU

Publication

EP 0910728 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97923973 A

Priority

  • DE 19627982 A
  • EP 9702611 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19627982A1] An hydraulic play compensating element (1) is disclosed, for example for a valve gear mechanism of an internal combustion engine. Its play compensating function is ensured by a defined leak gap (14). The components (3, 5) contiguous to the leak gap (14) are designed in such a way that the leak gap (14) has an optimum size over the whole range of operation temperatures of the element (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/24; F01L 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/24 (2006.01); F01L 1/08 (2006.01); F01L 1/25 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/25 (2013.01); F01L 1/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19627982 A1 19980115; BR 9710286 A 19990817; EP 0910728 A1 19990428; EP 0910728 B1 20000719; JP 2000514521 A 20001031; WO 9802645 A1 19980122

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2016-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702065

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150730

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-03-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH & CO. KG, 91074 HERZOGENAURACH, DE

- Document: DE 59702065

- Effective date: 20150210

2014-03-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG & CO. KG, 91074 HERZOGENAURACH, DE

- Document: DE 59702065

- Effective date: 20140218

2014-03-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG & CO. KG, 91074 HERZOGENAURACH, DE

- Document: DE 59702065

- Effective date: 20140218

2012-10-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH & CO. KG, 91074 HERZOGENAURACH, DE

- Document: DE 59702065

- Effective date: 20120828

2012-10-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH & CO. KG, 91074 HERZOGENAURACH, DE

- Document: DE 59702065

- Effective date: 20120828

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090523

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090522

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090522

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080514

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090522

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080528

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080530

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080509

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-11-29 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-07-28 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2006-07-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000925

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702065 20000824

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-07-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1999-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991019

1999-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981215

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE