Global Patent Index - EP 0910858 B1

EP 0910858 B1 2000-09-27 - SWITCHING CONTACT ARRANGEMENT WITH A HINGE ARRANGEMENT FOR A CONTACT LEVER

Title (en)

SWITCHING CONTACT ARRANGEMENT WITH A HINGE ARRANGEMENT FOR A CONTACT LEVER

Title (de)

SCHALTKONTAKTANORDNUNG MIT EINER GELENKANORDNUNG FÜR EINEN KONTAKTHEBEL

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE CONTACT DE COMMUTATION POURVU D'UNE ARTICULATION DESTINEE A UN LEVIER DE CONTACT

Publication

EP 0910858 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97933631 A

Priority

  • DE 9701472 W
  • DE 19629482 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19629482C1] A switching contact arrangement (3) for a low voltage power switch (1) has at least one contact lever (10) provided with a hinge arrangement which enables it to swivel with respect to a contact lever support (7). The hinge arrangement has a rolling surface (22) located on the contact lever (10) and a bearing surface (23) located on the support (17) of the contact lever. A retaining hoop (27) prevents the contact lever from moving in a direction parallel to the bearing surface (23).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/22 (2006.01); H01H 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/226 (2013.01); H01H 1/24 (2013.01); H01H 2001/228 (2013.01); H01H 2009/305 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19629482 C1 19970911; EP 0910858 A1 19990428; EP 0910858 B1 20000927; WO 9802892 A1 19980122

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050709

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2003-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030201

2002-07-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020726

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-09-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010919

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-09-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702407 20001102

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991221

1999-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990105

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT