Global patent index - EP 0910861 B1

EP 0910861 B1 2000-02-09 - PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING AN ELECTROMAGNETIC RELAY

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING AN ELECTROMAGNETIC RELAY

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ELEKTROMAGNETISCHEN RELAIS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN RELAIS ELECTROMAGNETIQUE

Publication

EP 0910861 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97931620 A

Priority

  • DE 9701229 W
  • DE 19627845 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19627845C1] A relay is composed of two shell halves produced by injection-moulding plastics around the functional elements. A first shell half (1) is formed by injection-moulding plastics around a coil (3) with a U-shaped core (6), whereas the second shell half (2) is formed by injecting plastics around a spring carrier (21) and at least one fixed contact element (22, 23). A contact spring (4) is secured to the spring carrier with a flat armature. The relay is adjusted and at the same time sealed when the two shell halves (1, 2) are joined.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 11/00 (2006.01); H01H 49/00 (2006.01); H01H 50/02 (2006.01); H01H 50/04 (2006.01); H01H 50/24 (2006.01); H01H 50/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 49/00 (2013.01); H01H 11/0056 (2013.01); H01H 50/041 (2013.01); H01H 50/023 (2013.01); Y10T 29/4902 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49073 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49105 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49121 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19627845 C1 19970918; AT 189746 T 20000215; CN 1075237 C 20011121; CN 1225190 A 19990804; EP 0910861 A1 19990428; EP 0910861 B1 20000209; JP 2000514234 A 20001024; US 6272734 B1 20010814; WO 9801878 A1 19980115

INPADOC legal status

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080731

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070731

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-04-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20020617

2002-06-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020617

2002-06-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020617

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010531

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-05-03 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010503

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-05-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010502

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000530

2000-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-05 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: TYCO ELECTRONICS LOGISTICS AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701119

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-16

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2000-02-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-02-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 189746

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990622

1999-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990105

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT