Global Patent Index - EP 0910862 B1

EP 0910862 B1 2000-02-09 - ARRANGEMENT OF A RELAIS TOGETHER WITH A CONTROL COMPONENT

Title (en)

ARRANGEMENT OF A RELAIS TOGETHER WITH A CONTROL COMPONENT

Title (de)

ANORDNUNG EINES RELAIS MIT EINEM STEUERBAUSTEIN

Title (fr)

AGENCEMENT D'UN RELAIS AVEC UN COMPOSANT DE COMMANDE

Publication

EP 0910862 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97930339 A

Priority

  • DE 9701246 W
  • DE 29612042 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9801881A1] A control component has a substantially square housing (11) with a coupling side (14) that can be connected by means of plugs to a matching connection side (25) of a square relay housing (21). Complementary plug-in connecting elements (26, 27) which can be mechanically and electrically interconnected are provided in the coupling side (14) and in the matching connection side (25) to electrically and mechanically couple the control component (10) to the relay (20). An universal relay may thus be transformed into a special relay with a particular special function by plugging the control component on the relay.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 50/02; H01H 50/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 45/04 (2006.01); H01H 50/02 (2006.01); H01H 50/04 (2006.01); H01H 50/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/021 (2013.01); H01H 50/02 (2013.01); H01H 50/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29612042 U1 19960905; AU 3433397 A 19980202; EP 0910862 A1 19990428; EP 0910862 B1 20000209; JP 2000514236 A 20001024; KR 20000023655 A 20000425; US 6184762 B1 20010206; WO 9801881 A1 19980115

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080731

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-04-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020618

2002-06-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020618

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010531

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-05-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010502

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000530

2000-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-05 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: TYCO ELECTRONICS LOGISTICS AG

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701120 20000316

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-02-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000209

1999-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990623

1999-07-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ARRANGEMENT OF A RELAIS TOGETHER WITH A CONTROL COMPONENT

1999-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990105

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT