Global patent index - EP 0910927 B1

EP 0910927 B1 2000-01-12 - PROCESS FOR CODING AND DECODING STEREOPHONIC SPECTRAL VALUES

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR CODING AND DECODING STEREOPHONIC SPECTRAL VALUES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM CODIEREN UND DECODIEREN VON STEREOAUDIOSPEKTRALWERTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE CODAGE ET DE DECODAGE DE VALEURS SPECTRALES STEREOPHONIQUES

Publication

EP 0910927 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97925036 A

Priority

  • DE 19628292 A
  • EP 9702874 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19628292A1] In a process for coding stereophonic spectral values, the stereophonic spectral values are first grouped into scaling factor bands (28) to which are associated scaling factors. Sections are then formed which consist of at least one scaling factor band (28). The spectral values are coded in at least one section with a coding table associated to the section among a plurality of coding tables associated each to a coding table number. The number of the used coding table is transmitted together with the coded stereophonic spectral values as supplementary information. At least one additional coding table number is provided which does not relate to a coding table but gives information relevant to the section to which the coding table is associated. A process for decoding stereophonic spectral values which have been partially coded by an intensity stereo process and contain supplementary information uses the relevant information given by the additional coding table numbers to undo the coding of the stereophonic spectral values.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04S 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/00 (2006.01); G10L 19/02 (2006.01); H04H 20/88 (2008.01); H04S 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04S 1/007 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19628292 A1 19980115; DE 19628292 B4 20070802; AT 188832 T 20000115; AU 3031897 A 19980209; AU 712196 B2 19991028; CA 2260090 A1 19980122; CA 2260090 C 20001017; DE 59701014 D1 20000217; DK 0910927 T3 20000508; EP 0910927 A1 19990428; EP 0910927 B1 20000112; ES 2143868 T3 20000516; GR 3032444 T3 20000531; JP 2000505266 A 20000425; JP 3622982 B2 20050223; KR 20000022435 A 20000425; NO 317570 B1 20041115; NO 990106 A 19990310; NO 990106 D0 19990111; PT 910927 E 20000428; US 6771777 B1 20040803; WO 9803036 A1 19980122

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150625

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-09-23 [REG DE R008] CASE PENDING AT FEDERAL PATENTS COURT (FPC)

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R008

- Ref Document Number: 59701014

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-09-23 [REG DE R039] REVOCATION ACTION FILED

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R039

- Ref Document Number: 59701014

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150617

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20150622

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150625

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150625

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20150622

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20150622

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150525

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-01-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

- Owner name: AT & T LABORATORIES/RESEARCH

- Free Format Text: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V.#LEONRODSTRASSE 54#80636 MUENCHEN (DE) $ AT & T LABORATORIES/RESEARCH#180 PARK AVENUE#FLORHAM PARK, NJ 07932 (US) $ LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES#BELL LABORATORIES, 600 MOUNTAIN AVENUE#MURRAY HILL, NJ 07974-0636 (US) -TRANSFER TO- AT & T LABORATORIES/RESEARCH#180 PARK AVENUE#FLORHAM PARK, NJ 07932 (US) $ LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES#BELL LABORATORIES, 600 MOUNTAIN AVENUE#MURRAY HILL, NJ 07974-0636 (US) $ FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V.#HANSASTRASSE 27 C#80686 MUENCHEN (DE)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2143868

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-05-08 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-04-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000131

2000-04-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000313

2000-03-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59701014

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000217

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-02-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-01-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 188832

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20000115

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1999-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990601

1999-07-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BRANDENBURG, KARLHEINZ

1999-07-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DIETZ, MARTIN

1999-07-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GBUR, UWE

1999-07-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GERHAEUSER, HEINZ

1999-07-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HERRE, JUERGEN

1999-07-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JOHNSTON, JAMES

1999-07-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TEICHMANN, BODO

1999-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990105

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE