Global Patent Index - EP 0910975 A3

EP 0910975 A3 2000-08-09 - Air bed system

Title (en)

Air bed system

Title (de)

Luftmatratzensystem

Title (fr)

Système de matelas à air

Publication

EP 0910975 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98630058 A

Priority

US 95035797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0910975A2] An air bed system including three separate airtight segments (28,30,32) secured together in a linear fashion to form an air mattress sized to fit a standard bed size. Each segment of the air mattress is independently inflatable, allowing a sleeper to adjust the level of support provided for his or her head, lumbar, and foot region by altering the air pressure within each segment. By placing two air mattresses side by side, a larger size air bed may be constructed suitable for use by two separate sleepers, with each air mattress having individually adjustable support and comfort levels. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 27/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/08 (2006.01); A47C 27/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/082 (2013.01); A47C 27/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0910975 A2 19990428; EP 0910975 A3 20000809; EP 0910975 B1 20040317; AT 261687 T 20040415; DE 69822394 D1 20040422; DE 69822394 T2 20050224; DE 910975 T1 19991209; DK 0910975 T3 20040726; JP H11187953 A 19990713

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151027

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-10-29 [PGRI CH] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Effective date: 20100714

2010-07-30 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: LE BREVET A ETE REACTIVE SELON LA DEMANDE DE POURSUITE DE LA PROCEDURE DU 14.07.2010

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081201

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071009

2008-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071009

2008-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BOYD FLOATATION INC.

- Effective date: 20071031

2006-11-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20061124

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061025

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-24 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20061024

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-06-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041220

2005-03-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-11-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-07-26 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-06-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040628

2004-06-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040617

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69822394 P 20040422

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB LI NL SE

2004-03-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-03-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-03-17 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-03-17 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB LI NL SE

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010205

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-09 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

1999-10-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB LI NL SE

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI