Global Patent Index - EP 0910976 A3

EP 0910976 A3 2000-10-04 - Garment hanger

Title (en)

Garment hanger

Title (de)

Wäschebügel

Title (fr)

Cintre pour vêtements

Publication

EP 0910976 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98118953 A

Priority

DE 29718336 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0910976A2] A hanger (1) for e.g. T-shirts, bras, swim suits and underskirts includes a central hook (2). In the upper surfaces of both halves (1a, 1b), moulded-in flat depressions (3) are covered by pre-tensioned spring strips (4). These lie flush with the upper surface of the hanger. Clothing is gripped by the strip against the depression. In this novel design, the strip is joined in one piece with the rest, at its end. The strip ends terminate short of the hanger ends. The upper surfaces of the depressions, act as rests for the strips, near their ends. The hanger is plastic, especially polystyrene.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 25/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/486 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29718336 U1 19980212; AT 247917 T 20030915; EP 0910976 A2 19990428; EP 0910976 A3 20001004; EP 0910976 B1 20030827

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151007

2016-06-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 247917 T

- Effective date: 20151007

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121007

2013-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-07-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130628

2013-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121007

2013-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: W. *WILLPUTZ KUNSTSTOFFVERARBEITUNGS G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20121031

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111103

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20111024

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101021

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-05-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040107

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809402 P 20031002

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB NL

2003-08-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021219

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE FR GB NL

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010314

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB NL

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI