Global Patent Index - EP 0911089 A3

EP 0911089 A3 2000-02-23 - Device and method for the quick changing of rolls in a six-high rolling stand

Title (en)

Device and method for the quick changing of rolls in a six-high rolling stand

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren für schnellen Walzenwechsel an einem Sechswalzen-Walzgerüst

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour changer rapidement les cylindres d'une cage de laminoir à six cylindres

Publication

EP 0911089 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98118625 A

Priority

DE 19747013 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911089A2] Each seating element (11, 12) for seating a lower intermediate roll (23, 23') with its bearing blocks (19, 19') has an intermediate frame (3, 4) which can be driven in and out of the side shifter cassette (10). Each seating element (11, 12) for seating a lower intermediate roll (23, 23') with its bearing blocks (19, 19') has an intermediate frame (3, 4) which can be driven in and out of the side shifter cassette (10). The method includes preparation of the roll stand for roll changing, positioning of the roll changing trolley (1) and the gripper trolley, extraction of the rolls to be changed from the roll stand, removal of the gripper trolley with rolls, positioning of the side shifter cassette (10) with new rolls, and use of the gripper trolley to insert these new rolls into the roll stand. It further includes steps concerned with use of the intermediate frames (3, 4) and a crane to complete the roll changing operations.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 31/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 31/08 (2006.01); B21B 31/10 (2006.01); B21B 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 31/103 (2013.01); B21B 2013/028 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [DYA] EP 0112981 A2 19840711 - SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]
  • [A] DE 1527706 A1 19700122 - SCHLOEMANN AG
  • [YA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 112 (M - 298) 25 May 1984 (1984-05-25)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 103 (M - 0941) 26 February 1990 (1990-02-26)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 02 29 February 1996 (1996-02-29)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 042 (M - 359) 22 February 1985 (1985-02-22)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 003, no. 023 (C - 038) 26 February 1979 (1979-02-26)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0911089 A2 19990428; EP 0911089 A3 20000223; EP 0911089 B1 20011121; AT 209073 T 20011215; DE 19747013 A1 19990429; ES 2168714 T3 20020616; JP 4435888 B2 20100324; JP H11192504 A 19990721; US 6053020 A 20000425

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151023

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SMS GROUP GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59802698

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-08-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59802698

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HEMMERICH & KOLLEGEN, DE

2002-11-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2168714

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-03-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020225

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59802698

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-02-21

2002-02-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-11-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 209073

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010503

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981001

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI