Global Patent Index - EP 0911098 A3

EP 0911098 A3 2000-05-17 - Casting plant for metals, in particular for aluminium alloys

Title (en)

Casting plant for metals, in particular for aluminium alloys

Title (de)

Giessanlage für Metalle, insbesondere für Aluminium-Legierungen

Title (fr)

Installation de coulée pour métaux, notamment pour alliages d'aluminium

Publication

EP 0911098 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98119660 A

Priority

  • DE 29718891 U
  • DE 19746837 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911098A2] The casting assembly for metals, and especially aluminium alloys, is split into a static smelting and casting crucible station, a casting system and a casting table. The smelting and casting crucibles are one-piece units of cast iron or cast iron alloy. The smelting crucible (37,37a) is at a higher level than the casting crucible (38), recognised by the crucible opening slits (39,39a,39b) where there is a metal flow, separated by dividing slides (40) with height adjustment. The casting crucible (38) has a rounded metal outflow opening, and otherwise on a longitudinal or extended rounded construction the molten metal overflows through two outlet openings. At the outflow opening zone of the casting crucible (38), the crucible base is strengthened by raising the crucible base according to the shoulder of the round insertion block, and a casting system inserted into the base for pouring into a mould fitted to the casting table.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 15/04; B22D 21/04; B22D 41/00; B22D 41/16; B22D 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 41/00 (2006.01); B22D 41/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 41/16 (2013.01); B22D 41/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0911098 A2 19990428; EP 0911098 A3 20000517

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021217

2001-03-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010130

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001111

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 22D 15/04 A, 7B 22D 41/00 B, 7B 22D 41/16 B, 7B 22D 47/00 B, 7B 22D 21/04 B

1999-06-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FEMUK BETRIEBSBERATUNG GMBH

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI