Global Patent Index - EP 0911107 A3

EP 0911107 A3 2000-12-20 - Control apparatus of arc welding robot

Title (en)

Control apparatus of arc welding robot

Title (de)

Schweissroboterregeleinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de contrôle de robot soudage

Publication

EP 0911107 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98118623 A

Priority

  • JP 26848497 A
  • JP 26848597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911107A2] By the input means at the time of teaching, the allowable width for the command value (central value) are entered. The robot main body is taught, and operated according to the data stored in the memory means, and the CPU judges if the actual welding value taken in during actual welding from external interface means is within the upper and lower allowable range width corresponding to the entered welding condition command value, and when the actual welding value is out of the allowable range, the operation information of the robot can be immediately displayed by information noticing means, or may be stored in the memory means, and displayed in batch at the end of one welding stroke. The arc welding condition is monitored only during the regular welding section, and can be ignored in the crater treatment section, or the section of unstable welding condition right after start of welding can be excluded from the welding condition monitoring object section. As required, depending on the characteristic of the wire feeder, the condition of crater treatment can be changed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23K 9/12; B23K 9/095

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23K 9/10 (2006.01); G05B 19/4068 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B23K 9/1062 (2013.01); B23K 9/1037 (2013.01); G05B 19/4068 (2013.01); G05B 2219/31469 (2013.01); G05B 2219/31483 (2013.01); G05B 2219/45104 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] JP H05261538 A 19931012
  • [AD] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 06 28 June 1996 (1996-06-28)
  • [AD] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 005 (M - 1349) 6 January 1993 (1993-01-06)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0911107 A2 19990428; EP 0911107 A3 20001220; EP 0911107 B1 20040303; DE 69822063 D1 20040408; DE 69822063 T2 20050127; EP 1308234 A2 20030507; EP 1308234 A3 20030514; EP 1308234 B1 20130306; US 6107601 A 20000822

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160927

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160913

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151013

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-01-06 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20091215

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-06-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69822063

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT NL SE

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-11-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020918

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB IT NL SE

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001218

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 23K 9/12 A, 7B 23K 9/095 B

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT NL SE

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI