Global Patent Index - EP 0911116 B1

EP 0911116 B1 2001-12-12 - Grinding article and mounting device

Title (en)

Grinding article and mounting device

Title (de)

Schleifkörper und Befestigungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Article de meulage et dispositif de fixation

Publication

EP 0911116 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98811026 A

Priority

CH 247597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911116A1] The grinding disk (1) structure has overlapping grinding blades (2) forming fan structures on both sides of a carrier (3), and secured to it to form a grinding surface (4). The fan layers of the grinding blades are against each other on both sides of the carrier. The carrier matches the whole shape of the grinding surface. The carrier has at least one opening (5) with a mounting (6) for fitting to a drive motor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 13/16; B24B 55/05; B24D 7/16; B24D 13/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 55/05 (2006.01); B24D 7/16 (2006.01); B24D 13/16 (2006.01); B24D 13/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 55/052 (2013.01); B24D 7/16 (2013.01); B24D 13/16 (2013.01); B24D 13/20 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DE 9002384 U1 19900503

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0911116 A1 19990428; EP 0911116 B1 20011212; AT 210538 T 20011215; DE 59802418 D1 20020124; DK 0911116 T3 20020408; ES 2172110 T3 20020916; PT 911116 E 20020531; US 6110027 A 20000829

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071015

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071016

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2009-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20071016

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071015

2008-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061010

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071015

2008-06-25 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIA SCHWEIZER SCHMIRGEL- UND SCHLEIFINDUSTRIE A.G

- Effective date: 20041031

2007-01-04 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070104

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20061124

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061012

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061011

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050501

2005-06-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20050415

2005-06-06 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2005-05-31 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050501

2005-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIA SCHWEIZER SCHMIRGEL- UND SCHLEIFINDUSTRIE A.G

- Effective date: 20041031

2005-04-15 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050415

2004-11-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041016

2004-10-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041015

2004-10-15 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041015

2004-04-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20030807

2004-01-28 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-11-20 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20031120

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20031031

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20031029

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20031029

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-20 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20031020

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-17 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20031017

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-16 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20031016

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: SIA ABRASIVES INDUSTRIES AG

2003-01-06 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KLINGSPOR GMBH

2002-11-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KLINGSPOR GMBH

- Effective date: 20020912

2002-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2172110 T3

2002-07-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-06-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: SIA ABRASIVES INDUSTRIES AG

2002-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020314

2002-04-08 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-04-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SIA ABRASIVES INDUSTRIES AG

2002-03-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HEPP, WENGER & RYFFEL AG

2002-03-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Free text: SIA SCHWEIZER SCHMIRGEL- UND SCHLEIFINDUSTRIE AG TRANSFER- SIA ABRASIVES INDUSTRIES AG

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802418 20020124

2002-01-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210538 T 20011215

2000-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-01-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-11-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990901

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI