Global Patent Index - EP 0911129 A3

EP 0911129 A3 2000-08-16 - Mould for making pressed articles

Title (en)

Mould for making pressed articles

Title (de)

Form zur Herstellung von Formkörpern

Title (fr)

Moule pour la fabrication d'articles pressés

Publication

EP 0911129 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98111929 A

Priority

DE 19737248 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19737248A1] The mold has several mold chambers and a vertically movable loading plate connected by hydraulic cylinders to vertically movable pressure plates for the mold chambers. The common pressure source for the hydraulic cylinders (7, 7') is a hydraulic store. A locking valve (28) is fitted in the hydraulic line (25) from the store to the hydraulic cylinders. Each pressure plate (2) may be allocated to at least one hydraulic cylinder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 3/02; B30B 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 3/02 (2006.01); B28B 3/06 (2006.01); B30B 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 3/021 (2013.01); B28B 3/06 (2013.01); B30B 15/067 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19737248 A1 19990318; EP 0911129 A2 19990428; EP 0911129 A3 20000816

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-23 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030215

2003-01-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOBRA FORMEN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021022

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE DK FI NL SE

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FI NL SE

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI