Global Patent Index - EP 0911199 B1

EP 0911199 B1 2002-12-18 - Pivotable sliding door

Title (en)

Pivotable sliding door

Title (de)

Schwenkschiebetür

Title (fr)

Porte pivotante coulissante

Publication

EP 0911199 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98811056 A

Priority

  • EP 98811056 A
  • EP 97810785 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911199A1] The arrangement includes a door (80,90) which is connected by a nut element (20,30). The nut element is adjustable through a spindle (10), according to a spindle-nut drive, horizontally along a vehicle wall (14) comprising the door aperture. The spindle is driven through rotating drive devices (60,64) which comprise a self restraint in such a way that a sure locking of the door is guaranteed in closed position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60J 5/06; E05F 15/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/14 (2006.01); E05F 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/655 (2013.01); E05F 1/16 (2013.01); E05F 15/652 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/216 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/22 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/234 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/246 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/434 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/478 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/702 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/522 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/112 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/25 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/506 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/51 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0911199 A1 19990428; EP 0911199 B1 20021218

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806702

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091023

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101004

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091022

2010-10-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100923

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091022

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2010-06-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FBT FAHRZEUG- UND MASCHINENBAU A.G.

- Effective date: 20091031

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081010

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080930

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20081017

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20081029

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20081024

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-08-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806702 20030130

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806702 P 20030130

2002-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI SE

2002-12-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 229893 T 20030115

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010702

2000-01-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE FR GB LI SE

1999-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991006

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI SE

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI