Global Patent Index - EP 0911253 A3

EP 0911253 A3 2000-05-17 - Power unit for vehicle

Title (en)

Power unit for vehicle

Title (de)

Antriebseinheit für Fahrzeug

Title (fr)

Unité motrice pour véhicule

Publication

EP 0911253 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98119637 A

Priority

JP 28896497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911253A2] A power unit for a vehicle in particular for a motorcycle having an internal combustion engine (3) mounted in a condition where a crank shaft (47) is oriented in the longitudinal direction of the vehicle body, and having a transmission (70) arranged behind the internal combustion engine (3), wherein one or both of a transmission actuating electric motor (72) for driving a transmission actuating device (70e,70f) of said transmission (70) and a clutch actuating electric motor (71) for driving a clutch actuating device (69f,74,75,77) of a clutch (69) are arranged in a rear section of said power unit. With this arrangement the space between the rear forks can be used effectively and there is more space for the driver's legs. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B62M 25/08; B60K 17/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 61/02 (2006.01); F16H 61/32 (2006.01); F16H 63/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 61/02 (2013.01); F16H 61/32 (2013.01); F16H 63/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0911253 A2 19990428; EP 0911253 A3 20000517; EP 0911253 B1 20031126; DE 69820004 D1 20040108; DE 69820004 T2 20040603; US 6357545 B1 20020319

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111016

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-07-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120629

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101020

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101020

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060503

2004-11-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040827

2004-09-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040915

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69820004 P 20040108

2003-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000717

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI