Global Patent Index - EP 0911257 A3

EP 0911257 A3 2000-02-23 - Helicopter blade aerofoil

Title (en)

Helicopter blade aerofoil

Title (de)

Hubschrauber-Rotorblattprofil

Title (fr)

Profil de pale d'hélicoptère

Publication

EP 0911257 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98203566 A

Priority

JP 29130097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911257A2] Upper and lower surfaces of an aerofoil are defined by the following coordinates given in the table below, and the configuration of a leading edge of the aerofoil is defined by the following leading edge radius and the center of circle. Thus drag divergence Mach number Mdd and maximum lift coefficient Clmax can be increased and the noise level can be reduced. <TABLE> Leading edge radius r/C =0.01073 Center of circle X/C=0.01072, Y/C=-0.00373

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B64C 27/467

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B64C 27/46 (2006.01); B64C 27/467 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B64C 27/467 (2013.01); Y10S 416/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0911257 A2 19990428; EP 0911257 A3 20000223; JP 3051366 B2 20000612; JP H11124093 A 19990511; US 6164918 A 20001226

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020806

2002-06-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011217

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT FR GB IT

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT FR GB IT

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI