Global Patent Index - EP 0911272 B1

EP 0911272 B1 2001-04-11 - Container and closure as well as method of manufacturing the closure

Title (en)

Container and closure as well as method of manufacturing the closure

Title (de)

Einsteckdeckel, Dose damit und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Récipient et couvercle ainsi que le procédé de fabrication du couvercle

Publication

EP 0911272 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98119916 A

Priority

  • EP 98119916 A
  • EP 97118584 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911272A1] Lid is formed from the same cardboard cylinder section as the container shell (2). It is manufactured separately from the container body so that a sealing membrane overlapping the container edge can be formed. Preferably the closing face (3) of the lid is not flat and the contact zone (5) acts as a spring member. An Independent claim is included for a method to manufacture the lid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 43/04; B65D 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 21/02 (2006.01); B65D 43/02 (2006.01); B65D 43/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 21/022 (2013.01); B65D 43/022 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00092 (2013.01); B65D 2543/0024 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00268 (2013.01); B65D 2543/0037 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00416 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00509 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00546 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0911272 A1 19990428; EP 0911272 B1 20010411

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111021

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 200456 T

- Effective date: 20111021

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111021

2012-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-07-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120629

2012-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111021

2012-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GRABHER WERNER

- Effective date: 20111031

2011-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20101022

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20101021

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101026

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101028

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: GRABHER, WERNER

- Free text: GRABHER, WERNER#OBERWINGERTSTRASSE 8#9436 BALGACH (CH) -TRANSFER TO- GRABHER, WERNER#OBERWINGERTSTRASSE 8#9436 BALGACH (CH)

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011030

2001-09-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-08-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010710

2001-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUECHEL, KAMINSKI & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE ESTABLI

2001-07-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-07-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800614 20010517

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-04-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-04-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200456 T 20010415

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991209

2000-01-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-07-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990517

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI