Global patent index - EP 0911434 A3

EP 0911434 A3 2000-07-19 - Ring spinning spindle with yarn cutting device

Title (en)

Ring spinning spindle with yarn cutting device

Title (de)

Ringspinnspindel mit einem Trennmesser

Title (fr)

Broche de filature à anneaux avec dispositif pour la coupe du fil

Publication

EP 0911434 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98119832 A

Priority

DE 19746536 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911434A2] The yarn cutter (15) is a single cylindrical or slightly conical flat pot-shaped component. Its edge has projecting cam tooth structures (18') with blunt edges and set-back cutters (17') with sharp edges. In an Independent claim the cutter is deep-drawn from a plate, with material cutting to form the sharp edges. It may be sintered from powder metal, or it may be die cast or injection molded, followed by edge sharpening and plating. Preferred Features:- The cutter (15) is a drawn metal plate component, with an outer edge worked to give distributed cutting tooth sections aligned towards the ring spinner spindle, to form cam structures. The outer edge of the cutter can be shaped into overlapping tabs giving alternating cutting edges (17') and projecting cam structures (18'), with the tabs for the cams aligned towards the spindle. The cams can be formed by bending back the tongue tabs. A gap is between the cams and the cutters. The cams (18') are angled against the spindle axis, so that the free ends point away from the spindle axis. The cutter can be structured so that projecting corrugations (24) act as the cam structures and the valleys are the cutters.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 9/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 7/04 (2006.01); D01H 9/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 9/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0911434 A2 19990428; EP 0911434 A3 20000719; EP 0911434 B1 20030409; DE 19746536 A1 19990429; DE 19746536 C2 20020801; JP H11189936 A 19990713; US 6042045 A 20000328

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151031

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151020

2016-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151031

2016-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-08-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER AND PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANW, CH

2013-08-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ZHUOLANG TEXTILE MACHINERY CO. LTD., CN

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071212

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040112

2003-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE IT LI

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI