Global Patent Index - EP 0911437 B1

EP 0911437 B1 2000-04-19 - Embroidery machine, particularly of the Schiffli type, with movable thread guide

Title (en)

Embroidery machine, particularly of the Schiffli type, with movable thread guide

Title (de)

Stickmaschine, insbesondere Schifflistickmaschine, mit beweglichem Fadenleiter

Title (fr)

Machine à broder, en particulier de type Schiffli, avec guide fil mobile

Publication

EP 0911437 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97810797 A

Priority

EP 97810797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911437A1] The embroidery machine, and especially a shuttle embroidery machine, has an individual thread guide (17) which can be moved in and out of action for each embroidery point (S1-S3). A switch unit simultaneously moves the needles (15) and the thread guides (17) in and out of action at an embroidery point (S1-S3), and also acts on a further unit such as a fabric drill (43), thread brake and/or thread monitor at the embroidery point (S1-S3). A coupling (51,53,69), at a unit (15,43,17) to be switched in and out of action, engages a straight edge (33,42,37) according to the position of the switch unit for one or more embroidery points (S1-S3), or is held by the switch unit in a disengaged position. A spring holds the couplings in the engaged position, to be moved against the spring action by the switch unit. The switch unit has a trough at a switch rod to secure the coupling away from the straight edge. The switch unit is operated pneumatically. The thread guide (17) is between two thread deflectors, and moves across the line of thread travel in a vertical movement. An eyelet (65) is at a thread guide lever (63), which is given a translatory movement by a swing shaft (61). The thread guide lever can be linked at an intermediate lever, as a swing coupling. The thread guide lever (63) is operated by a unit (37,35,25,11) which is engaged and disengaged. A common drive shaft (11) operates a number of units (15,17) at an embroidery point (S1-S3) with an additional and independent switch unit to switch needles (15) and/or thread guide (17) at a needle slide. The thread guide (17) for one embroidery point is operated independently of the thread guides (17) at the other embroidery points.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D05C 11/16; D05C 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D05C 11/10 (2006.01); D05C 11/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D05C 11/10 (2013.01); D05C 11/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0911437 A1 19990428; EP 0911437 B1 20000419; AT 191940 T 20000515; DE 59701477 D1 20000525

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161031

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-08-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG;ELESTASTRASSE 8;7310 BAD RAGAZ (CH)

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071027

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-07-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-12-04 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20020618

2002-04-10 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: SAURER STICKSYSTEME AG

- Effective date: 20010119

2001-03-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SAURER STICKSYSTEME AG

- Effective date: 20010119

2000-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701477

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-25

2000-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

2000-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 191940

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-01-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE IT LI

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990622

1999-05-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990329

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI