Global Patent Index - EP 0911450 A3

EP 0911450 A3 2001-03-21 - Attachments for digger buckets

Title (en)

Attachments for digger buckets

Title (de)

Zusatzgeräte für Baggerschaufel

Title (fr)

Accessoires pour godets d'excavatrice

Publication

EP 0911450 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98308653 A

Priority

GB 9722488 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911450A2] An attachment is provided for mounting on a digger bucket having projecting teeth. The attachment includes a jaw (10) which can be fitted over an edge of the bucket, a locking assembly (18) for holding the jaw (10) in engagement with the edge of the bucket, and load transfer means (27, 31) for transferring a significant proportion of the weight of an object being lifted to the digger teeth. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 3/96

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/96 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/962 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0911450 A2 19990428; EP 0911450 A3 20010321; GB 9722488 D0 19971224

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010922

2002-01-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI