Global Patent Index - EP 0911452 A3

EP 0911452 A3 2000-03-01 - Driving device, branch pipe inspecting/cleaning method, and branch pipe inspecting/cleaning device

Title (en)

Driving device, branch pipe inspecting/cleaning method, and branch pipe inspecting/cleaning device

Title (de)

Antriebsvorrichtung, Methode zur Inspektion/Reinigung von abzweigenden Rohren und Vorrichtung zu ihrer Durchführung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'entraînement, méthode d'inspection/nettoyage des embranchements de canalisation et dispositif associé

Publication

EP 0911452 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98308671 A

Priority

  • JP 29234497 A
  • JP 29240497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911452A2] A driving device enables an elastic hose (1) having a tip portion to which a TV camera (6) and/or a reverse jet nozzle (5) are attached, to be smoothly introduced into a branch pipe (51), so that the inside of the branch pipe can be positively and easily inspected and cleaned from the side of a main pipe (50). In one embodiment, a driving device (10) for moving the elastic hose (1) backward and forward by the action of fluid pressure is constituted by a pressure hose/cylinder unit (11) in which the elastic hose is inserted, a pig/piston unit (13) attached to the outer circumference of the elastic hose (1) and sliding in the pressure hose (11), and a compressor (pressure fluid supplying unit) for alternately supplying compressed air (pressure fluid) into airtight spaces (S1, S2) formed with the pig (13) in the pressure hose (11). The driving device (10) moves the elastic hose (1) backward and forward always positively by a large constant driving force of not a conventional frictional force but the fluid pressure, so that even if the branch pipe has a plurality of curves, the elastic hose (1) can be always smoothly introduced into the branch pipe. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03F 7/12; E03F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03F 7/12 (2006.01); E03F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03F 9/00 (2013.01); E03F 7/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] US 4756510 A 19880712 - KLAMM KENNETH G [US], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0911452 A2 19990428; EP 0911452 A3 20000301; KR 19990037364 A 19990525

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060414

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011217

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK FR GB

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000901

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI