Global Patent Index - EP 0911456 A3

EP 0911456 A3 2000-10-18 - Mountable pitched roof and roof slab for use therein

Title (en)

Mountable pitched roof and roof slab for use therein

Title (de)

Geneigtes Montagedach und dafür verwendbare Dachtafeln

Title (fr)

Toit incliné montable et panneau de toiture utilisable à cet effet

Publication

EP 0911456 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98115322 A

Priority

DE 19746778 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911456A2] Hook-like anchorage fittings (13) are positioned at the ridge-side end faces (12) of the rafters (5), to allow fastening of the roof panel (3) to the ridge purlin (6). The ridge purlin has an upwards-facing mounting for suspension of the anchorage fittings. Preferably the ridge purlin is a timber or prestressed concrete beam, with an angle iron on the top as mounting.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 7/20; E04B 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 7/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 7/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0911456 A2 19990428; EP 0911456 A3 20001018; DE 19746778 A1 19990429

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-08 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20041015

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR GB IE IT LI NL

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 04B 7/20 A, 7E 04B 7/04 B

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IE IT LI NL

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI