Global Patent Index - EP 0911466 A3

EP 0911466 A3 2000-10-18 - Wearfree programmable electronic locking device

Title (en)

Wearfree programmable electronic locking device

Title (de)

Verschleissfreie programmierbare elektronische Schliessvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif électronique programmable de fermeture sans usure

Publication

EP 0911466 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98119014 A

Priority

DE 29718319 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911466A2] The security system has a programmable electronic key (2.0) which is positioned into the electronic lock (1.0) with which it has a contactless communication via transceivers (1.3, 2.3) in each unit. A programmed code in the memory (2.1) of the key is compared with a stored code in the lock memory (1.1) to operate the release of the lock. Additional security is provided by crypto-graphic blocks (1.5, 2.4) in each unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 49/00; G07C 9/00; G07F 17/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00309 (2013.01); G07C 9/00896 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00412 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00603 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00777 (2013.01); G07C 2209/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29718319 U1 19980122; AT 257206 T 20040115; EP 0911466 A2 19990428; EP 0911466 A3 20001018; EP 0911466 B1 20040102; EP 0911466 B2 20100120

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160818

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20041009

2010-01-20 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20100120

2010-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2005-01-12 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: GANTNER ELECTRONIC GMBH

- Effective date: 20041001

2005-01-12 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KARL SIMON GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20041004

2004-12-01 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: GANTNER ELECTRONIC GMBH

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-12-01 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KARL SIMON GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20041004

2004-10-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040413

2004-02-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040121

2004-02-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810523 P 20040205

2004-01-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FEIG ELECTRONIC GMBH

2004-01-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FEIG ELECTRONIC GMBH

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2002-11-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020918

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010418

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 05B 49/00 A, 7G 07F 17/12 B, 7G 07C 9/00 B

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI