Global Patent Index - EP 0911468 B1

EP 0911468 B1 2000-12-27 - Sliding security bolt

Title (en)

Sliding security bolt

Title (de)

Verschiebbarer Sicherheitsriegel

Title (fr)

Targette de sécurité

Publication

EP 0911468 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98402673 A

Priority

FR 9713455 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911468A1] The security bolt comprises a body in which a key (6) translates. A control lever (3) displaces the key between neutral and armed positions. Disarming means enable the key to be moved from the armed to the neutral position. These means comprise a slider (11) which is translated relative to the key by the control lever during movement of the key to its armed position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 1/04 (2006.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 63/00 (2006.01); E05C 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 1/04 (2013.01); E05B 63/0069 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0069 (2013.01); E05C 1/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0911468 A1 19990428; EP 0911468 B1 20001227; DE 69800457 D1 20010201; DE 69800457 T2 20010823; DE 911468 T1 19991007; ES 2156431 T3 20010616; FR 2770250 A1 19990430; FR 2770250 B1 20000825

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69800457

2015-06-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69800457

- Representative's name: RUCKH, RAINER, DIPL.-PHYS. DR.RER.NAT., DE

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141024

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091028

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110317

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091028

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091027

2011-03-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110330

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091027

2010-06-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20081014

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081029

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081007

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080902

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-10-17 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: EUCHNER FRANCE SARL

2001-08-01 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: EUCHNER FRANCE SARL

2001-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2156431 T3

2001-04-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010320

2001-03-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2001-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800457 20010201

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2000-05-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2000-03-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT LU NL SE

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991214

2000-01-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT SE

1999-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991004

1999-10-07 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI