Global Patent Index - EP 0911470 A3

EP 0911470 A3 2001-05-30 - Locking device

Title (en)

Locking device

Title (de)

Verriegelungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage

Publication

EP 0911470 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98114432 A

Priority

DE 29718982 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911470A2] The main lock case is connected to the at least one extra lock case (3) by at least one drive rod (11). The extra lock case has a catch bolt (10) which slides back freely into the extra lock case from the catch position. The catch bolt is pushed by a spring (28) and or a gear. The side of the catch bolt opposite a leading slope (22) has a protuberance (43) near the tail of the catch (34). A catch restoring lever (40) touches the protuberance and has a first (46) and second (47) carrier.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/18; E05B 59/00; E05C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/02 (2006.01); E05C 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/026 (2013.01); E05C 9/1841 (2013.01); E05B 59/00 (2013.01); E05B 63/202 (2013.01); Y10T 70/5226 (2015.04); Y10T 70/5235 (2015.04); Y10T 70/5239 (2015.04); Y10T 292/0974 (2015.04); Y10T 292/0982 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29718982 U1 19980205; AT 278860 T 20041015; DK 0911470 T3 20050207; EP 0911470 A2 19990428; EP 0911470 A3 20010530; EP 0911470 B1 20041006; ES 2226041 T3 20050316; US 2001047671 A1 20011206; US 6327881 B1 20011211

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-05-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2015-05-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59812079

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 278860 T

- Effective date: 20140801

2015-03-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59812079

2013-10-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130813

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130821

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090802

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2010-10-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090803

2010-07-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100430

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090801

2010-04-06 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2010-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-03-31 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GRETSCH-UNITAS G.M.B.H. BAUBESCHLAGE

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-02-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080918

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080821

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080813

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080825

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080814

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080814

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080828

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080813

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-09-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050707

2005-09-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2226041 T3

2005-02-07 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2004-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2004-11-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812079 P 20041111

2004-11-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041007

2004-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2004-10-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GRETSCH-UNITAS GMBH BAUBESCHLAEGE

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030606

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010428

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI