Global Patent Index - EP 0911476 B1

EP 0911476 B1 2002-09-04 - Frame for a roller blind fitted with mechanisms capable of automatically closing the blind which protects a window or a french window

Title (en)

Frame for a roller blind fitted with mechanisms capable of automatically closing the blind which protects a window or a french window

Title (de)

Rollorahmen mit einer Vorrichtung zum selbständigen Schliessen eines Rollvorhanges der ein Fenster oder eine Fenstertür schützt

Title (fr)

Cadre pour store enroulable avec mécanisme capable de fermer automatiquement le store enroulable qui protège un fenêtre ou une porte-fenêtre

Publication

EP 0911476 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97118224 A

Priority

EP 97118224 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911476A1] A frame comprises a first roller shutter box (1) housing a take-up roller (2), and a second roller shutter box (3) wherein a shaft (4) turns; a first elastic mechanism (5) rotates the take-up roller (2), while a second elastic mechanism (6) rotates the shaft (4); the take-up roller (2) stretches a blind (7) which is drawn between the take-up roller (2) and a manoeuvring bar (8) sliding on two guides (9,10); two pulleys (11,12) are splined to the ends of the shaft (4) for manoeuvring two tie rods (13,14) connected to the manoeuvring bar (8); the tie rods (13,14) are located inside the respective guides (9,10) for transmitting the tensile stress of the second elastic mechanism (6) to the manoeuvring bar (8); this stress prevails on the stress of the first elastic mechanism (5), therefore the blind (7) closes the French window when only the stresses of both elastic mechanisms (5,6) are applied to the blind (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 1/00; E06B 9/54; E06B 9/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/54 (2006.01); E06B 9/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/60 (2013.01); E06B 9/54 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0911476 A1 19990428; EP 0911476 B1 20020904; AT 223551 T 20020915; DE 69715205 D1 20021010

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-06-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-02-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-05 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021205

2002-12-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715205 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223551 T 20020915

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010709

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991020

2000-01-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;SI