Global Patent Index - EP 0911479 A3

EP 0911479 A3 2000-11-15 - Device for operating vertical flexible doors

Title (en)

Device for operating vertical flexible doors

Title (de)

Vorrichtung für die Betätigung von vertikalen flexiblen Toren

Title (fr)

Dispostif de commande pour portes verticales flexibles

Publication

EP 0911479 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98118838 A

Priority

IT TV970047 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911479A2] A device for operating vertical flexible doors comprising a roll-up tube (7) which is internally provided with means for the insertion of a gearmotor (11) and of a spring-loaded balancing element (12), the tube being provided with means for connection to a coupling element and with means for the quick connection of a sheet. The roll-up tube (7) also has first brackets with which a stroke limiter assembly and an assembly for loading the balancing element are associated; the first brackets are associable with lateral posts with which second slotted brackets for wall mounting are slidingly associated; the tube, the sheet and the posts are constituted by individual connectable elements. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/13; E06B 9/17; E06B 9/44; E06B 9/46; E06B 9/58; E06B 9/60; E06B 9/72

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/08 (2006.01); E06B 9/17 (2006.01); E06B 9/44 (2006.01); E06B 9/46 (2006.01); E06B 9/58 (2006.01); E06B 9/60 (2006.01); E06B 9/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/08 (2013.01); E06B 9/17061 (2013.01); E06B 9/44 (2013.01); E06B 9/46 (2013.01); E06B 9/58 (2013.01); E06B 9/60 (2013.01); E06B 9/72 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] EP 0751278 A1 19970102 - BUBENDORFF SA [FR]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0911479 A2 19990428; EP 0911479 A3 20001115; BR 9803907 A 19991116; IT 243113 Y1 20020228; IT TV970047 U1 19990420; IT TV970047 V0 19971020

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040709

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR IT

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010502

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 06B 9/13 A, 7E 06B 9/72 B, 7E 06B 9/60 B, 7E 06B 9/17 B, 7E 06B 9/44 B, 7E 06B 9/46 B, 7E 06B 9/58 B

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI