Global Patent Index - EP 0911481 A3

EP 0911481 A3 2000-05-31 - Turnstile for a passage way for persons

Title (en)

Turnstile for a passage way for persons

Title (de)

Drehkreuz für einen Personendurchgang

Title (fr)

Tourniquet pour un passage de personnes

Publication

EP 0911481 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98118944 A

Priority

DE 19746978 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911481A2] Shaft carries a shaped block (8) on which a lock mechanism (12) acts to control direction of rotation of shaft (7) in steps. A rotary damper (15) is provided which has its effect on the rotary movement of the shaft. The shaft preferably has a connection to the damper through a shaft gear (14) and a gear (16) on the damper.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 53/86 (2006.01); E06B 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 53/86 (2013.01); E06B 11/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0911481 A2 19990428; EP 0911481 A3 20000531; DE 19746978 A1 19990429

INPADOC legal status


2001-11-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-10-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001201

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI