Global patent index - EP 0911488 A4

EP 0911488 A4 2000-11-29 - GAS TURBINE COOLING STATIONARY BLADE

Title (en)

GAS TURBINE COOLING STATIONARY BLADE

Title (de)

KÜHLUNG VON STATORSCHAUFELN IN GASTURBINEN

Title (fr)

PALE FIXE DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE TURBINE A GAZ

Publication

EP 0911488 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98917726 A

Priority

  • JP 9801958 W
  • JP 11384597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911488A1] In a cooled stationary blade assembly for a gas turbine, an interior of a blade and an inner shroud are cooled by steam to eliminate the use of air cooling. Steam passages 33A, 33B, 33C, 33D, 33E and 33F are provided in the stationary blade 30. The cooling steam 39 is introduced from the steam passage 33A on the front edge side through an outer shroud and passes, in order, through the steam passages 33B, 33C, 33D, and 33E to flow into the steam passage 33F at the rear edge side to cool the interior of the blade, and is recovered through the outer shroud from the upper portion of the steam passage 33F. A portion of the steam from the steam passage 33A is introduced into the inner shroud 31, enters to steam passages 20 from a steam introduction passage 22, branches to the right and left through both end portions, and flows out into the steam passage 33F at the rear edge from a steam discharge passage 21. Not only the interior of the blade, but also the interior of the inner shroud 31 is cooled by the steam so that the cooling air is dispensed with. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 9/04; F01D 5/18; F01D 25/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/18 (2006.01); F01D 9/02 (2006.01); F01D 9/04 (2006.01); F02C 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 9/02 (2013.01); F01D 5/187 (2013.01); F05D 2240/10 (2013.01); F05D 2240/81 (2013.01); F05D 2260/22141 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 5320483 A 19940614 - CUNHA FRANCISCO J [US], et al
  • [X] EP 0698723 A2 19960228 - GEN ELECTRIC [US]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 379 (M - 1447) 16 July 1993 (1993-07-16)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 133 (M - 1383) 19 March 1993 (1993-03-19)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 360 (M - 1634) 7 July 1994 (1994-07-07)
  • See also references of WO 9850684A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0911488 A1 19990428; EP 0911488 A4 20001129; EP 0911488 B1 20040128; CA 2261184 A1 19981112; CA 2261184 C 20020709; DE 69821312 D1 20040304; DE 69821312 T2 20050804; JP 3276305 B2 20020422; JP H10306706 A 19981117; WO 9850684 A1 19981112

INPADOC legal status

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-06-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI HITACHI POWER SYSTEMS, LTD., YOKOHA, JP

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69821312

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-06-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69821312

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PA, DE

2005-01-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2005-01-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-12-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-08-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-04-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-03-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69821312

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-03-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-01-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-01-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-01-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-01-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-01-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TOMITA, YASUOKIC/O TAKASAGO MACHINERY WORKS

2004-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: AOKI, SUNAOC/O TAKASAGO MACHINERY WORKS

2004-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SUENAGA, KIYOSHIC/O TAKASAGO RES. & DEVEL. CEN

2004-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ISHIGURO, TATSUOC/O TAKASAGO RES. & DEVEL. CEN

2003-08-13 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: GAS TURBINE COOLED STATIONARY BLADE

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021017

2000-11-29 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20001017

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-11-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 01D 9/04 A, 7F 01D 25/12 B, 7F 01D 5/18 B

1999-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981230

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI