Global patent index - EP 0911516 B1

EP 0911516 B1 2001-03-21 - Starter having pinion rotation restricting member and plunger movement restricting member

Title (en)

Starter having pinion rotation restricting member and plunger movement restricting member

Title (de)

Anlasser mit Mitteln zur Begrenzung der Rotation des Ritzels und zur Begrenzung der Bewegung des Electromagnetkolbens

Title (fr)

Démarreur muni de moyens pour limiter la rotation du pignon et de moyens pour limiter le mouvement du noyau de l'électroaimant

Publication

EP 0911516 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98119807 A

Priority

JP 28643297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911516A1] In a starter (1), a plate (34) that turns with a pinion moving body (4) is disposed behind the pinion moving body (4). The plate (34) has a receiving part (34c) that engages with the lower extension (5b) of a rotation restricting member (5) for restricting the rotation of the pinion moving body (4) until a pinion gear (30) engages with a ring gear (29). In a power supply circuit for a starter motor (2), a first switch (53, 57) and a second switch (51, 55) are provided. The first switch turns on first to energize the starter motor (2). When the pinion gear (30) engages with the ring gear (29) thereafter, the second switch (51, 55) turns on to energize further the starter motor (2) by short-circuiting a resistor wire (56). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02N 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 15/02 (2006.01); F02N 11/08 (2006.01); F02N 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/0851 (2013.01); F02N 15/067 (2013.01); F02N 11/087 (2013.01); F02N 2300/102 (2013.01); H01H 50/543 (2013.01); H01H 51/065 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0911516 A1 19990428; EP 0911516 B1 20010321; DE 69800621 D1 20010426; DE 69800621 T2 20010628; JP 3505979 B2 20040315; JP H11117839 A 19990427; US 6114772 A 20000905

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091019

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091019

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100630

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081015

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081014

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081029

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081016

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-05-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69800621

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-26

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-01-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

1999-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990927

1999-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990311

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI