Global Patent Index - EP 0911589 A3

EP 0911589 A3 2000-05-24 - Air opening device for room ventilation

Title (en)

Air opening device for room ventilation

Title (de)

Luftauslassvorrichtung zur Raumbelüftung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sortie d'air pour la ventilation d'un local

Publication

EP 0911589 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98203455 A

Priority

IT PN970055 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911589A2] Air opening device for room ventilation with a louver and/or multifunctional louvers made of plastic material. The air opening device comprises a first air opening ( A ) having baffles ( 15 ) to control the direction of the airflow and , if required , a second air opening ( B ) connectable thereto and provided with slats ( 8 ) which are laterally connected to toothed wheels ( 7 ) made of molded plastic material. The toothed wheels are so reciprocally connected that the deflection applied to a slat ( 8 ) is transmitted to the others ( 8 ) and changes the airflow rate. The casing of the first air opening ( A ) is formed by an "L" shaped element ( 1 ). Magnets ( M ) are applicable to the external part ( 11 ) of the "L" shaped element ( 1 ) , which is forming the frame for the application to the wall, to produce magnetic actraction on the rim ( 91 ) of the metallic conduit ( 9 ) and to allow the removable fixing of the casing. The casings of the air openings ( A-B ) and their baffles and slats ( 15 and 8 ) are formed by extruded pieces of plastic material which can be cut into different lengths thus allowing to obtain air opening devices ( A-B ) having different dimensions. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 13/075

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/075 (2006.01); F24F 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/075 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0911589 A2 19990428; EP 0911589 A3 20000524; IT 1296332 B1 19990625; IT PN970055 A1 19990420

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001125

2001-03-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI