Global Patent Index - EP 0911596 A3

EP 0911596 A3 2000-04-26 - Tube-like radiator with lower connection

Title (en)

Tube-like radiator with lower connection

Title (de)

Röhrenheizkörper mit unterem Anschluss

Title (fr)

Radiateur avec connection inférieure

Publication

EP 0911596 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98113260 A

Priority

DE 19747274 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911596A2] To a horizontal tube (4a), particularly to the lowest tube, the forward and backward flow connection (5,6) is fixed. The tube beneath both connections runs further and in the area between the connections has a narrowed formation (8) preventing through passage. The narrowed formation can be formed by a squeezing of the tube, a part spherical shape, a plug or a flat wall.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 1/04; F28F 9/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/12 (2006.01); F28D 1/053 (2006.01); F28F 9/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/262 (2013.01); F24D 19/0002 (2013.01); F24D 19/0036 (2013.01); F24D 19/0048 (2013.01); F28D 1/05316 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0036 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0911596 A2 19990428; EP 0911596 A3 20000426; DE 19747274 A1 19990429

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-23 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030528

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020410

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LU NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LU NL PT SE

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI