Global Patent Index - EP 0911706 B1

EP 0911706 B1 2001-05-30 - A device for direct electrostatic printing with a conventional printhead structure and AC-coupling to the control electrode

Title (en)

A device for direct electrostatic printing with a conventional printhead structure and AC-coupling to the control electrode

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum direkten elektrostatischen Drucken mit einer konventionellen Druckkopfstruktur und Wechselspannung zur Steuerelektrode

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'impression électrostatique directe avec une structure d'une tête d'impression conventionelle et un circuit de couplage AC à l'électrode de commande

Publication

EP 0911706 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97203268 A

Priority

EP 97203268 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911706A1] A device for direct electrostatic printing is provided comprising means for creating a flow of charged toner particles (102) from a means (103) for delivering charged toner particles, having a surface bearing toner particles, to an image receiving substrate (108) applying a DC-potential difference between the means for delivering charged toner particles and the image receiving substrate and a printhead structure (106) having control electrodes (106a), interposed in the flow of toner particles for image-wise controlling the flow of toner particles, the printhead structure controlling the flow of toner particles by switching an AC-field (119) between the toner delivery means and the control electrodes on for pixels of image density and off for pixels of no image density. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/34; B41J 2/415

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/385 (2006.01); B41J 2/415 (2006.01); G03G 15/05 (2006.01); G03G 15/08 (2006.01); G03G 15/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/346 (2013.01); B41J 2/4155 (2013.01); G03G 2217/0025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0911706 A1 19990428; EP 0911706 B1 20010530; DE 69705045 D1 20010705; DE 69705045 T2 20011122; JP H11198428 A 19990727

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-11 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20021020

2003-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030501

2002-10-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021020

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-20 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010831

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010829

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69705045 20010705

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2001-05-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2000-03-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000131

2000-01-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB

1999-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991028

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB