Global Patent Index - EP 0911767 A3

EP 0911767 A3 2000-09-27 - Method for data entry in a franking machine and apparatus for for franking mail

Title (en)

Method for data entry in a franking machine and apparatus for for franking mail

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Dateneingabe in eine Frankiermaschine und Anordnung zum Frankieren von Postgut

Title (fr)

Procédé d'entrée de données dans une machine d'affranchissement et dispositif d'affranchissement du courrier

Publication

EP 0911767 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99250017 A

Priority

  • DE 4213278 A
  • DE 4302097 A
  • DE 4312894 A
  • EP 93250112 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0566225A2] The invention relates to a method for data input in a franking machine before triggering a selected printing function, an arrangement for franking mail and for generating a franking image in each case allocated to a cost point. The method comprises the following steps: - automatic changing of the last status of stored data contents in a franking machine for adjusting it within a time window after switching on by means of a first transmission means (10) and/or - automatic input of an accounting number for the cost point of the user and/or a printing function or the number of a printing function in a memory area of the memory means (3) of the franking machine, by means of a further transmission means (13). During a dialog, data for the chipcard number card , for the cost point number KST and for the block number AD are read out of the unprotected memory area or, after automatic password input via the franking machine, from the protected memory area of the chipcard and used in the franking machine for setting the cost point and the associated advertising block. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00024 (2013.01); G07B 17/0008 (2013.01); G07B 17/00193 (2013.01); G07B 17/00314 (2013.01); G07B 17/00362 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00032 (2013.01); G07B 2017/0012 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00177 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00241 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00346 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00379 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00395 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00403 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00604 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00701 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0566225 A2 19931020; EP 0566225 A3 19950405; EP 0566225 B1 19990804; DE 59310378 D1 20051006; EP 0911767 A2 19990428; EP 0911767 A3 20000927; EP 0911767 B1 20050831

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090416

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090416

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090416

2009-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080421

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080412

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080426

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080415

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080214

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-08-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-01-04 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

2005-12-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051129

2005-10-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59310378 P 20051006

2005-08-31 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0566225 P

2005-08-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2005-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-08-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030814

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010122

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-09-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07B 17/00 A

1999-04-28 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 566225

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI