Global Patent Index - EP 0911768 B1

EP 0911768 B1 2000-08-02 - High-capacity apparatus for ejecting circular plate bodies

Title (en)

High-capacity apparatus for ejecting circular plate bodies

Title (de)

Grossraumscheibenvereinzelungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Distributeur de disques à grande capacité

Publication

EP 0911768 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98116114 A

Priority

JP 30141397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911768A1] This invention was developed provide an apparatus for ejecting circular plate bodies with a greatly improved receiving capacity for circular plate bodies such as coins to be paid out, which can dispence all of circular plate bodies without leaving some behind. The invention is a high-capacity apparatus for ejecting circular plate bodies, comprising first tank means (41) which is in the form of tube having openings at its upper and lower ends and being provided inclined, an outlet (43) for the circular plate bodies (C), ejecting means (46) for ejecting a circular plate body which is rotatable end provided slantingly within the first tank means, second tank means (56) which is in a large tubular form and arranged to substantially communicate with the upper opening of the first tank means, and conveying means (52) for conveying the circular plate bodies from the second tank means (56) to the first tank means (41) which has the form of a big ring and is provides rotatably at the upper opening of the first tank means, wherein that a groove (61) is formed along the inside of the lower opening of second tank means (56). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 1/00 (2006.01); G07D 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 9/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FI GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0911768 A1 19990428; EP 0911768 B1 20000802; AU 748127 B2 20020530; AU 8519098 A 19990415; CA 2242855 A1 19990326; CA 2242855 C 20060411; ES 2151308 T3 20001216; JP 3791725 B2 20060628; JP H11102454 A 19990413

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100827

2011-10-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20111019

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100826

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100826

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100826

2011-03-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20110301

2009-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090814

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090827

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090814

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090820

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2151308

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FI GB NL

2000-02-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-01-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: ES FI GB NL

1999-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990906

1999-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990112

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FI GB NL

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI