Global patent index - EP 0911776 A3

EP 0911776 A3 2000-01-12 - Alarm system and method

Title (en)

Alarm system and method

Title (de)

Gefahrenmeldeanlage und Verfahren zum Betrieb derselben

Title (fr)

Système et procédé d'alarme

Publication

EP 0911776 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98119814 A

Priority

DE 19746392 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911776A2] The hazard warning system has a central processing station (9) coupled to several hazard alarms, esp. for smoke and/or fire (8), and/or sensors, esp. spatial monitoring sensors (11,13,17), of one or more buildings (2) for common detection of information, esp. warnings and/or measurement values. The central processing station is coupled to one or more hazard warning and/or operating centres (15) and/or a higher level building control centre (14) for passing on warnings, measurement values and/or combination results.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 29/18; G08B 25/00; G08B 25/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 25/14 (2006.01); G08B 29/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 29/24 (2013.01); G08B 25/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0911776 A2 19990428; EP 0911776 A3 20000112

INPADOC legal status

2004-03-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030903

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020515

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK FR IT LI LU NL SE

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000404

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 08B 29/18 A, 7G 08B 25/14 B, 7G 08B 25/00 B

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR IT LI LU NL SE

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI