Global Patent Index - EP 0911779 A3

EP 0911779 A3 2000-08-09 - Method and device for monitoring road traffic over a large surface area

Title (en)

Method and device for monitoring road traffic over a large surface area

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur grossflächigen Verkehrslageüberwachung

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil de surveillance de la circulation routière sur une grande surface

Publication

EP 0911779 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98115967 A

Priority

DE 19746570 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911779A2] A satellite or aircraft (3) using radar and infra red methods is used to monitor a road network (1). Information is relayed to a ground station (6) and is processed to determine traffic flow data. The movement of specific vehicles (2) can be monitored and any abnormal conditions determined.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/04; G01S 13/91; G01S 13/92; G08G 1/127

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/01 (2006.01); G08G 1/04 (2006.01); G08G 1/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/04 (2013.01); G08G 1/0104 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0911779 A2 19990428; EP 0911779 A3 20000809; DE 19746570 A1 19990506; JP H11224396 A 19990817; US 6285949 B1 20010904

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-08-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020705

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 08G 1/04 A, 7G 08G 1/127 B, 7G 01S 13/91 B, 7G 01S 13/92 B

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI