Global Patent Index - EP 0911786 B1

EP 0911786 B1 2002-09-11 - Laserlabels and their use

Title (en)

Laserlabels and their use

Title (de)

Laseretiketten und ihre Verwendung

Title (fr)

Etiquettes à laser et leur application

Publication

EP 0911786 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98119458 A

Priority

DE 19746998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911786A2] The label comprises at least one layer of plastics, coated on one side with a self-adhesive material covered with antiadhesive paper or film. An optical, magnetic or electric marking additive is added to the plastics. The additive may be rendered visible by IR or UV light, or may be color pigments, particles or fibers, e.g. arranged in a fingerprint pattern.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/02; G09F 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/10 (2013.01); B41M 5/267 (2013.01); Y10T 428/14 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1405 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24876 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24893 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24901 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2839 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31551 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0911786 A2 19990428; EP 0911786 A3 19991229; EP 0911786 B1 20020911; DE 19746998 A1 19990429; DE 19746998 B4 20080605; ES 2182200 T3 20030301; US 6309724 B1 20011030

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131016

2014-11-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20141107

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131015

2014-08-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140630

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131015

2014-07-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805492

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131015

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121022

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121026

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121019

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121031

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121031

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-04-15 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: TESA SE

- Effective date: 20110415

2010-04-09 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2010-04-09 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182200 T3

2002-11-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021029

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805492 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TESA AG

2001-01-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001214

2000-09-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991125

2000-01-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 09F 3/02 A, 7G 09F 3/10 B

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI