Global Patent Index - EP 0911789 B1

EP 0911789 B1 2001-05-30 - Sealed price tag holder

Title (en)

Sealed price tag holder

Title (de)

Geschlossene Preisschildhalterung

Title (fr)

Support fermé pour étiquette de prix

Publication

EP 0911789 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97830532 A

Priority

EP 97830532 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911789A1] A sealed transparent cover box-like holding frame of a printed price tag or label in display counters of edible goods, has a double-molded composite body of a substantially rigid plastic material that is premolded and which receives afterwards, in a separate molding process, a filling of an elastomer that besides forming a perimetral gasket lip also forms a padding onto which the printed price tag or label is more securely held upon closing a transparent front cover hinged to the composite frame body. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/202 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0911789 A1 19990428; EP 0911789 B1 20010530

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051022

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): IT

2000-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-02-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-01-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: IT

1999-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990729

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): IT

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI