Global Patent Index - EP 0911799 A3

EP 0911799 A3 2000-05-31 - Display control method and information processing apparatus

Title (en)

Display control method and information processing apparatus

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Steuerung der Leuchtdichte einer Anzeige

Title (fr)

Méthode et appareil de commande de la luminance d'un dispositif d'affichage

Publication

EP 0911799 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98301219 A

Priority

JP 28733897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911799A2] In a display unit, a luminance of a display part (1) having a luminance adjusting function is gradually decreased from a maximum luminance value to a minimum luminance value with lapse of time, even during an operation other than a luminance adjusting operation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 5/10; G09G 3/20; G09G 3/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/00 (2006.01); G02F 1/133 (2006.01); G06F 1/28 (2006.01); G06F 1/32 (2006.01); G09F 9/00 (2006.01); G09G 3/18 (2006.01); G09G 3/20 (2006.01); G09G 3/34 (2006.01); G09G 5/00 (2006.01); G09G 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/3406 (2013.01); G09G 2310/066 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0606 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0626 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0633 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0653 (2013.01); G09G 2330/02 (2013.01); G09G 2330/021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0911799 A2 19990428; EP 0911799 A3 20000531; CN 1215198 A 19990428; JP H11119877 A 19990430

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010827

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010216

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000829

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI