Global Patent Index - EP 0911837 A3

EP 0911837 A3 2000-05-24 - Insulator for medium and high voltage electric lines

Title (en)

Insulator for medium and high voltage electric lines

Title (de)

Isolator für elektrische Mittel- und Hochspannungsleitugen

Title (fr)

Isolateur pour lignes électriques à moyenne et haute tension

Publication

EP 0911837 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98203560 A

Priority

IT MI972407 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911837A2] Insulator for medium and high voltage electric lines comprising a supporting structural component for a plurality of ribs of insulating material characterised by the fact that said structural component is made as a single piece of high-performance thermoplastic polymeric material. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 17/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 17/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 17/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0911837 A2 19990428; EP 0911837 A3 20000524; IT 1295879 B1 19990528; IT MI972407 A1 19990425

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001127

2001-03-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI