Global Patent Index - EP 0911842 A3

EP 0911842 A3 2000-04-05 - Method for monitoring a tap changer

Title (en)

Method for monitoring a tap changer

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Funktionsüberwachung von Stufenschaltern

Title (fr)

Procédé de surveillance d'un sélecteur de prises

Publication

EP 0911842 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98116788 A

Priority

DE 19746574 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19746574C1] The method involves detecting a measurement value representing the actual state of the monitored switch at short time intervals. The position of the switch is detected during changeover and the detected values combined into a position. The overall position or time range is divided into sub regions corresp. to successive time functions during a changeover. A characteristic value of the measurement value in each sub region is determined using defined computational procedures and is compared with a data set in non-volatile memory and classified so that a classification value is associated with it as an identifier. The identifier is processed, stored and used to generate identity dependent messages.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 29/04 (2006.01); G01R 31/02 (2006.01); G05F 1/147 (2006.01); H01H 9/00 (2006.01); H01H 71/04 (2006.01); H02J 3/00 (2006.01); H02J 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/0005 (2013.01); H01H 2009/0061 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19746574 C1 19990204; AT 251793 T 20031015; BG 102769 A 19990430; BG 63481 B1 20020228; BR 9805104 A 19991109; BR 9805104 B1 20101214; CA 2250625 A1 19990422; CN 1109945 C 20030528; CN 1222695 A 19990714; CZ 295387 B6 20050713; CZ 9803289 A3 19990512; DK 0911842 T3 20040216; EP 0911842 A2 19990428; EP 0911842 A3 20000405; EP 0911842 B1 20031008; ES 2203862 T3 20040416; HK 1020800 A1 20040206; HU 221833 B1 20030128; HU 9802215 A2 19990528; HU 9802215 A3 20010129; HU 9802215 D0 19981228; JP H11225437 A 19990817; RU 2199809 C2 20030227; US 6100674 A 20000808

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160810

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-04-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140922

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MASCHINENFABRIK REINHAUSEN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2008-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-06-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-05-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070905

2008-05-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-05-13 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2008-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MASCHINENFABRIK *REINHAUSEN G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20070930

2006-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-27 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060927

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-05 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060905

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-11 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060811

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-09-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2203862

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-02-16 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2003-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59809854

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-11-13

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031008

2003-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWAELTE

2003-10-14 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-10-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

RO

2003-10-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-12-13 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: RO PAYMENT 19980905

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000310

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO PAYMENT 19980905;SI

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO PAYMENT 19980905;SI