Global patent index - EP 0911844 A3

EP 0911844 A3 2000-04-19 - Contact arrangement for electrical apparatus

Title (en)

Contact arrangement for electrical apparatus

Title (de)

Kontaktanordnung für ein elektrisches Gerät

Title (fr)

Agencement de contact pour appareil électrique

Publication

EP 0911844 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98118526 A

Priority

DE 19747044 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911844A2] The electrical push button switch has a movable contact (8) carrier in the form of an elastic material (1) that has a diaphragm section (5) and a stud (4). The contact is formed on the end of the stud which is guided in the sleeve section of a flanged insert (14). The stud has a sleeve of plastic (18) with good bearing properties. Fixed contacts (7) are formed on a circuit board (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 13/08; H01H 13/06; H01H 13/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/08 (2006.01); H01H 13/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/12 (2013.01); H01H 13/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0911844 A2 19990428; EP 0911844 A3 20000419; DE 19747044 A1 19990429

INPADOC legal status

2004-06-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031216

2004-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01H 13/06 A

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030605

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI FR GB IT SE

2000-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001017

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01H 13/08 A, 7H 01H 13/12 B, 7H 01H 13/06 B

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT SE

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI