Global Patent Index - EP 0911918 A3

EP 0911918 A3 2000-06-14 - Arrangement for the transmission of medium frequency current using a slip ring transmitter

Title (en)

Arrangement for the transmission of medium frequency current using a slip ring transmitter

Title (de)

Anordnung zur Übertragung mittelfrequenter Ströme mit einem Schleifringübertrager

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la transmission de courant de moyenne fréquence avec transmetteur à bague collectrice

Publication

EP 0911918 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98119973 A

Priority

  • DE 19747048 A
  • DE 19820416 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0911918A2] Electrical power is transmitted between parts with relative movement by a slip ring arrangement. This has a carrier (8) consisting of multiple thin metal foils (4) in a sandwich construction. Between adjacent foils are insulating layers (5) with electrical connections provided by pin inserts (7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 39/06; H01R 39/08; H01R 39/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 39/08 (2006.01); H01R 39/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 39/08 (2013.01); H01R 39/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0911918 A2 19990428; EP 0911918 A3 20000614; EP 0911918 B1 20020612

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161019

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-10-05 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20050316

2003-05-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SCHLEIFRING UND APPARATEBAU GMBH

- Effective date: 20030312

2002-11-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020721

2002-07-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804404 20020718

2002-06-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2002-06-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000925

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000523

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 39/06 A, 7H 01R 39/10 B, 7H 01R 39/08 B

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI