Global Patent Index - EP 0912062 A3

EP 0912062 A3 2000-07-26 - Image encoding apparatus, image encoding method, and image recording medium

Title (en)

Image encoding apparatus, image encoding method, and image recording medium

Title (de)

Bildkodierungsvorrichtung und -verfahren sowie Bildaufzeichnungsmedium

Title (fr)

Dispositif et méthode de codage d'image, et support d'enregistrement d'image

Publication

EP 0912062 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98308641 A

Priority

JP 28973097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0912062A2] The block reducing unit 201 reads one block out of each block group. The pixel reducing unit 202 reads pixels on one-out-of-four basis. The block reading unit 203 sequentially reads out images. The orthogonal transformation unit 205 performs orthogonal transformation. The quantization unit 206 performs a quantization. The encode amount predicting unit 207 calculates predicted encode amounts. The quantization width calculating unit 208 determines an optimum quantization width. The quantization table generating unit 209 generates an optimum quantization table. The block-assignment encode amount setting unit 210 calculates an encode amount to be assigned to each block. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 7/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06T 9/00 (2006.01); H04N 1/41 (2006.01); H04N 19/126 (2014.01); H04N 19/132 (2014.01); H04N 19/146 (2014.01); H04N 19/176 (2014.01); H04N 19/186 (2014.01); H04N 19/189 (2014.01); H04N 19/60 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 19/182 (2014.11); H04N 19/126 (2014.11); H04N 19/149 (2014.11); H04N 19/15 (2014.11); H04N 19/176 (2013.01); H04N 19/60 (2014.11); H04N 19/146 (2014.11)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0912062 A2 19990428; EP 0912062 A3 20000726; EP 0912062 B1 20040825; DE 69825836 D1 20040930; DE 69825836 T2 20050210; JP 3356663 B2 20021216; JP H11127355 A 19990511; US 2002196983 A1 20021226; US 6449395 B1 20020910; US 6584232 B2 20030624

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071022

2008-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061010

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071022

2006-10-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061019

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061018

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050526

2005-07-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69825836 P 20040930

2004-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-08-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030523

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010126

2001-04-11 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI