Global Patent Index - EP 0912193 A4

EP 0912193 A4 2000-11-02 - VACCINE TO PREVENT STREPTOCOCCAL ENDOCARDITIS

Title (en)

VACCINE TO PREVENT STREPTOCOCCAL ENDOCARDITIS

Title (de)

IMPFSTOFF ZUR VERHÜTUNG VON STREPTOKOKKEN ENDOCARDITIS

Title (fr)

VACCIN VISANT A PREVENIR L'ENDOCARDITE STREPTOCOCCIQUE

Publication

EP 0912193 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97932373 A

Priority

  • US 9711329 W
  • US 2017496 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9748417A1] FimA proteins from streptococci and enterococci, which are responsible for bacterial adherence to damaged heart tissue, are potent vaccines against a patient developing endocarditis. Recombinantly produced FimA proteins from S. parasanguis provide protection against S. parasanguis derived endocarditis, as well as endocarditis derived from several other streptococci. Conserved DNA regions in viridans streptococci and enterococci suggest that FimA from these strains will be broadly applicable as a vaccine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 39/00; A61K 39/02; A61K 39/09; A61K 39/38; C07K 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/09 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/315 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/315 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9310238 A1 19930527 - US HEALTH [US]
  • [X] BURNETTE-CURLEY D ET AL: "FimA, a major virulence factor associated with Streptococcus parasanguis endocarditis.", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, vol. 63, no. 12, December 1995 (1995-12-01), pages 4669 - 4674, XP002145681
  • [X] DATABASE CHEMABS [online] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE; 1996, VISCOUNT, HELEN BRAFF: "Pathogenesis and immunology of streptococcal endocarditis (Streptococcus parasanguis)", XP002145683, retrieved from STN Database accession no. 126:168903 & DISSERTATION 120 PP. AVAIL.: UNIV. MICROFILMS INT., ORDER NO. DA9703883 FROM: DISS. ABSTR. INT., B 1997, 57(9), 5475DISSERTATION 120 PP. AVAIL.: UNIV. MICROFILMS INT., ORDER NO. DA9703883 FROM: DISS. ABSTR. INT., B 1997, 57(9), 5475
  • [PX] VISCOUNT H B ET AL: "Immunization with FimA protects against Streptococcus parasanguis endocarditis in rats.", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, vol. 65, no. 3, March 1997 (1997-03-01), pages 994 - 1002, XP002145682
  • See also references of WO 9748417A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9748417 A1 19971224; AU 3584897 A 19980107; CA 2258011 A1 19971224; EP 0912193 A1 19990506; EP 0912193 A4 20001102; JP 2000514790 A 20001107

INPADOC legal status


2001-05-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001128

2000-11-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 39/00 A, 7A 61K 39/02 B, 7A 61K 39/38 B, 7C 07K 1/00 B, 7A 61K 39/09 B

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981215

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE